Financial history SOUTH HAMPSTEAD AND KILBURN COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP

Charity Number: 1128207
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £271.47k £330.55k £312.85k £382.59k £287.90k
Total expenditure £221.82k £292.36k £290.11k £309.40k £360.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £167.75k £180.86k £100.54k
Income from government grants £170.24k £199.82k £18.50k £16.99k £48.37k