WEST LONDON SOMALILAND COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WLSC provides IAG, tuitions for children from key stage 2 and onward and recreational trips. It also organises workshops for its beneficiaries to address issues of concerns like education, social inclusion and parenting. Annually, WLSC organises the Somaliland Community achievement Award and the celebration of Somaliland national day.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- City Of London
- Ealing
- Harrow
- Hillingdon
- Hounslow
Governance
- 27 February 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Liban Abadid | Chair | 17 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ahmed Aden | Trustee | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ismail Jama Askar | Trustee | 20 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Abdilaahi Warsama | Trustee | 20 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
AXEM Youssuf | Trustee | 20 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.12k | £117.68k | £72.47k | £27.33k | £34.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.76k | £80.19k | £74.60k | £57.83k | £28.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.00k | £20.19k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 23 March 2024 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 23 March 2024 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 February 2023 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 February 2023 | 13 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 MARCH 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 7 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
1. TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE SOMALILANDERS CITIZENS IN WEST LONDON BY: = (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING; = (B) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS; = (C) THE PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH; AND = (D) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 2. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON ALL ASPECTS OF THE SOMALILAND HISTORY AND CULTURE.
Area of benefit
WEST LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
West London Somaliland Community Centre
80 East Avenue
HAYES
Middlesex
UB3 2HR
- Phone:
- 0208 848 1180
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window