ROOM TO HEAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Room to Heal is a healing community for asylum seekers and refugees who have suffered torture and gross human rights violations. It provides therapeutic support groups,individual counselling/casework, and a range of creative activities, including a Mindfulness for trauma programme, a community gardening/social project, story-telling workshops, ESOL classes and rural community building retreats.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Throughout London
Governance
- 27 March 2009: Standard registration
- ROOM 2 HEAL (Previous name)
- ROOM2HEAL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Areej Mohamed Yassin Osman | Trustee | 23 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
EMEKA FORBES-HASTINGS-BROWN | Trustee | 09 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rim Ibrahim Rahimtulla | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susannah Fairweather | Trustee | 17 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Emily Haisley | Trustee | 06 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHELLE KNORR | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £273.62k | £485.11k | £311.89k | £359.07k | £423.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £262.86k | £286.97k | £358.11k | £343.44k | £431.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £80.22k | £200 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 NOVEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 17 MARCH 2009 AS AMENDED ON 06 JAN 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 JUL 2022
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: (A) RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; (B) OBTAINING REDRESS FOR THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; (C) RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; (D) RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; (E) PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AMONG INDIVIDUALS AND ORGANISATIONS; (F) PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE TO GOVERNMENT AND OTHERS ON HUMAN RIGHTS MATTERS; (G) CONTRIBUTING TO THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS LAW; (H) COMMENTING ON PROPOSED HUMAN RIGHTS LEGISLATION; (I) PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS; (J) INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF HUMAN RIGHTS; AND (K) ELIMINATING INFRINGEMENTS OF HUMAN RIGHTS. 2) TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY PREVENTING PEOPLE FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED, RELIEVING THE NEEDS OF THOSE PEOPLE WHO ARE SOCIALLY EXCLUDED AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Mildmay Community Centre
Woodville Road
LONDON
N16 8NA
- Phone:
- 02079232007
- Email:
- info@roomtoheal.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window