FITZWILLIAM COLLEGE IN THE UNIVERSITY OF CAMBRIDGE

Charity number: 1137496
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The objects of the Charity are: 1) to advance Education, Religion, Learning & Research in the University of Cambridge and 2) to provide a College wherein members of the University may work for Degrees in the University or may carry out postgraduate or other special studies at Cambridge.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity and another benefit.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 August 2010: Standard registration
  • 02 December 2019: Funds received from 1125771 FITZWILLIAM INFORMATION SERVICES TRUST LIMITED
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • FITZWILLIAM COLLEGE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

62 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dominic de Cogan Trustee 05 February 2025
None on record
David Samuel Hardman Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Dr Natalie Camille Morningstar Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Rebecca Emily Heath Trustee 01 October 2024
None on record
Dr Benjamin David Guy Trustee 29 November 2023
None on record
Prof Esra Ozyurek Baer Trustee 11 October 2023
None on record
Dr Itai Massad Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
Dr Mekayla Storer Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
Dr Alexander Carter Trustee 01 October 2023
None on record
Professor Andreas Vlachos Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Dr Alexander Cullen Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Dr Anke Arentsen Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Dr Anna Heenan Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Dr Nelson Saul Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Dr Qixiang Cheng Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Dr Saeed Kayhanian Trustee 01 October 2022
None on record
Timothy Williams Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Dr Davide Luca Trustee 01 October 2021
None on record
Dr Isaias Fanlo Gonzalez Trustee 01 August 2021
None on record
Peter Kristen O'Connor Trustee 21 June 2021
THE OUTCRY ENSEMBLE
Received: On time
Dr Elisa Galliano Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Roderick Giles Cantrill Trustee 01 October 2020
None on record
Professor Srinivasan Keshav FRSC Trustee 30 October 2019
None on record
Professor Giles Oldroyd Trustee 30 October 2019
None on record
Baroness Sally Morgan Trustee 01 October 2019
None on record
Dr Stevie Martin Trustee 01 October 2019
None on record
Dr Olenka Pevny Trustee 01 October 2019
None on record
Dr Celine Marie Anne Vidal Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Dr Jean-Michel Johnston Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Dr Jonathan Rogers Trustee 28 November 2018
None on record
Dr AARON D'SA Trustee 01 October 2018
None on record
PROFESSOR MICHAEL HUGH KENNY Trustee 01 June 2017
None on record
Dr RICHARD CHARLES POWELL Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
Dr CHRISTOS GENAKOS Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record
PROFESSOR IANTHI MARIA TSIMPLI Trustee 01 October 2016
None on record
Dr NICOLA JONES Trustee 01 October 2016
None on record
Dr GABRIEL GLICKMAN Trustee 01 October 2015
None on record
Dr JULIA GUARNERI Trustee 01 October 2015
None on record
Dr SUBHA MUKHERJI Trustee 15 October 2014
None on record
Dr STEPHEN SAWIAK Trustee 15 October 2014
None on record
Dr KASIA JANE BODDY Trustee 04 October 2012
None on record
Dr ANDREW JARDINE Trustee 29 February 2012
None on record
Dr MATTHEW WINGATE Trustee 12 December 2011
None on record
PROF BHASKAR VIRA Trustee 12 December 2011
None on record
Dr ANNA MARIA WATSON Trustee 12 December 2011
None on record
FRANCIS KNIGHTS Trustee
NATIONAL EARLY MUSIC ASSOCIATION
Received: On time
PROFESSOR DAVID ANTHONY COOMES Trustee
CAMBRIDGE PAST, PRESENT & FUTURE
Received: On time
Dr ANDREW WHEATLEY Trustee
None on record
PROFESSOR DAVID ANTHONY CARDWELL Trustee
None on record
Dr PETER JASON RENTFROW Trustee
None on record
Dr DILKUSH ROBERT OPHREM ABAYASEKARA Trustee
None on record
Dr PAUL ANTONY CHIRICO Trustee
None on record
Professor SIMON GATHERCOLE Trustee
None on record
Dr JOHN LEIGH Trustee
None on record
Dr JONATHAN MICHAEL CULLEN Trustee
None on record
Dr KOUROSH SAEB-PARSY Trustee
None on record
PROF EPAMINONDAS MASTORAKOS Trustee
None on record
Dr SARA OWEN Trustee
None on record
Dr ALEXEI KOVALEV Trustee
None on record
Dr RACHEL DEBORAH CAMINA Trustee
None on record
PROF JAMES ELLIOTT Trustee
None on record
Dr DAVID COLE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £10.53m £9.38m £12.73m £14.89m £17.38m
Total expenditure £10.57m £10.38m £13.75m £13.76m £13.50m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £2.10m £1.96m £4.01m £2.39m £4.79m
Income - Other trading activities £938.27k £182.14k £807.20k £1.94m £2.89m
Income - Charitable activities £7.45m £7.16m £9.01m £9.21m £9.79m
Income - Endowments £467.58k £354.95k £1.69m £732.04k £1.83m
Income - Investment £510.39k £434.90k £594.63k £1.14m £1.59m
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £203.12k £160.85k
Income - Legacies £440.48k £300.65k £180.31k £500.48k £1.71m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £9.05m £9.38m £12.36m £13.50m £10.99m
Expenditure - Raising funds £1.53m £997.59k £1.39m £261.42k £290.42k
Expenditure - Governance £140.16k £145.17k £175.97k £657.72k £667.17k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.22m

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Own use assets £73.25m £75.43m £74.53m £73.33m £72.27m
Long-term investments £74.67m £86.07m £95.10m £96.05m £101.63m
Other assets £1.47m £1.30m £19.18m £20.37m £24.57m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability -£2.98m -£3.91m -£2.68m -£1.70m £330.00k
Total liabilities £12.25m £15.45m £32.93m £33.42m £32.80m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2024 16 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2024 16 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2023 21 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 21 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2022 25 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 25 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2021 16 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 16 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 July 2020 08 June 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 08 June 2021 8 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
FITZWILLIAM COLLEGE
STOREYS WAY
CAMBRIDGE
CB3 0DG
Phone:
01223332067