SOUTHWARK REFUGEE COMMUNITIES FORUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
AWARNESS of the role of RCOs and the skills they offer COLLABORATION between RCOs, statutory and voluntary sectors INTEGRATION of RCOs into mainstream structures and the promotion of real refugee participation RESOURCES and opportunities for the effective development of RCOs capacity
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £78,039 from 3 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Southwark
Governance
- 21 October 2009: Standard registration
- SOPUTHWARK REFUGEE COMMUNITIES FORUM (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Faisal Maramazi | Trustee | 23 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Yohannes Sibhatu | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nihaya Al-Othmani | Trustee | 10 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Manuel Pierre Oliver Monade | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Jennifer Nandoo | Trustee | 23 February 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.63k | £35.14k | £49.38k | £125.63k | £200.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.33k | £30.91k | £36.95k | £67.97k | £105.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £69.87k | £78.04k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 18 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 NOVEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS WITHIN THE BOROUGH OF SOUTHWARK TO RELIEVE POVERTY, IMPROVE HEALTH, ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID PERSONS.
Area of benefit
SOUTHWARK
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. GILES CENTRE
81 CAMBERWELL CHURCH STREET
LONDON
SE5 8RB
- Phone:
- 02072774400
- Website:
-
southwarkrefugeecommunitiesforum.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window