BUDLEIGH SALTERTON LITERARY FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The funding, organisation and promotion of the annual Budleigh Salterton Literary Festival. Festival events are open to and attended by members of the public from across the community including our local schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 04 February 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HILARY SHIELS | Trustee | 28 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Thomas | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Milne | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Marston | Trustee | 23 July 2024 |
|
|||||
JANE Burton | Trustee | 02 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carol Ackroyd | Trustee | 06 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN BRIGGS | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Marion Jones | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £138.07k | £36.62k | £138.80k | £137.67k | £162.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £113.04k | £48.29k | £124.35k | £148.78k | £172.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION CONVERSION DATED 30 JUN 2021
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN EAST DEVON BY THE PROMOTION OF THE ARTS OF LITERATURE, POETRY, THE WRITTEN AND SPOKEN WORD, AND RELATED ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BY FOSTERING AND SUPPORTING THE WORK OF THE BUDLEIGH SALTERTON LITERARY FESTIVAL.
Area of benefit
EAST DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Fairfield Close
Exmouth
EX8 2BN
- Phone:
- 01395266672
- Email:
- ruth@budlitfest.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window