SHEFFIELD AND DISTRICT REFORM JEWISH CONGREGATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious, educational and cultural activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Barnsley
- Derbyshire
- Doncaster
- Nottinghamshire
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 30 December 2008: Standard registration
- 7 Hills Shul (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof Jane Ginsborg | Chair | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Shilling | Trustee | 16 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sara Carolyn McConnell | Trustee | 21 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Julia Vivien Western-Pick | Trustee | 18 December 2016 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Harold Kay | Trustee | 17 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
PENELOPE JUNE KAY | Trustee | 14 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA ESTELLE CUNNINGHAM | Trustee | 14 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MAURICE HAYES | Trustee | 23 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.06k | £14.02k | £16.32k | £17.08k | £24.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.33k | £22.20k | £27.08k | £24.01k | £32.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 07 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 NOVEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY IS A BODY OF PEOPLE, PROFESSING THE JEWISH FAITH, FORMED WITH THE OBJECTS OF PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PUBLIC WORSHIP, OF UNDERTAKING RELIGIOUS, CULTURAL, EDUCATIONAL AND CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES, AND OF PROMOTING AND ADVANCING UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN COMMUNITIES ( THE OBJECTS )
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O The Circle
33 Rockingham Lane
Sheffield
S1 4FW
- Phone:
- 0771 920 9259
- Email:
- enquiries@shef-ref.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window