Financial history ASKERN WARD COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP

Charity Number: 1128737
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.76k £10.10k £25.00k £22.60k £41.07k
Total expenditure £5.59k £11.29k £12.63k £46.85k £34.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £25.00k £13.74k £13.84k