ASKERN WARD COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal object of the Company is the regeneration of the Askern Ward in Doncaster.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £13,835 from 4 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableOne or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Doncaster
Governance
- 23 March 2009: Standard registration
- NORTH DONCASTER RURAL TRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Iris Beech | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Rev Andrew Brian West | Trustee | 02 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brenda McLaughlin | Trustee | 02 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Amy Elizabeth Butler | Trustee | 20 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Francis Jackson | Trustee | 20 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Wood | Trustee | 20 October 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.76k | £10.10k | £25.00k | £22.60k | £41.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.59k | £11.29k | £12.63k | £46.85k | £34.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £25.00k | £13.74k | £13.84k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 April 2024 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 August 2022 | 203 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 August 2022 | 568 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 JANUARY 2002
Charitable objects
A THE RELIEF OF POVERTY B THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT C THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING, OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE AND PROVIDING WORK EXPERIENCE FOR THE UNEMPLOYED D THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE, BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS OR TO EXISTING BUSINESSES E THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE PROVISION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS F THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING G THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES H THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE I THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES, HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES J THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT K THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE L THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME; AND M SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Askern Ward Community Partnership - Shakers
High Street
Askern
DONCASTER
South Yorkshire
DN6 0AB
- Phone:
- 01302 709192
- Email:
- awcpshakers@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window