THE MERRY OPERA COMPANY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education and to promote the appreciation and enjoyment of the public in music, theatre and the performing arts with particular but not exclusive reference to opera.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 07 January 2009: Standard registration
- MERRY OPERA (Working name)
- UNEXPECTED OPERA LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael de Styrcea | Chair | 11 December 2008 |
|
|
||||
Laura Booty | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Helena Claire Woodhouse | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Crispian George Besley | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA FLORENCE HILL | Trustee | 31 March 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110.71k | £64.79k | £70.40k | £131.88k | £169.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.21k | £66.53k | £82.40k | £140.14k | £143.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | 16 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 14 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 11 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 DECEMBER 2008. CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME 4 AUGUST 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TO PROMOTE THE APPRECIATION AND ENJOYMENT OF THE PUBLIC IN MUSIC, THEATRE AND THE PERFORMING ARTS WITH PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVE REFERENCE TO OPERA. TO PROMOTE OR SUPPORT SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE DIRECTORS MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
VEXOUR FARM
HAMPKINS HILL ROAD
CHIDDINGSTONE
EDENBRIDGE
TN8 7BB
- Phone:
- 01892871377
- Email:
- keynote@merryopera.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window