CHIPPING SHOW LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Agricultural & Horticultural Show held annually in August at Chipping, Lancashire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
Governance
- 15 January 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Glyn Davies | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
LEONARD ROGERSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL NEWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN NEARY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN STOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £51.13k | £3.79k | £4.13k | £66.32k | £59.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.51k | £4.32k | £2.46k | £48.12k | £46.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 16 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 September 2023
(These accounts |
16 August 2024 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 17 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 10 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 05 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 17 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 17 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF AGRICULTURAL, HORTICULTURAL AND RURAL CRAFTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC BY HOLDING AN ANNUAL SHOW
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Kirk Cottages
Chipping
PRESTON
PR3 2QN
- Phone:
- 07796146035
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window