BALUJI MUSIC FOUNDATION LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main areas of activity this year saw the development of the Inner Vision Music Workshops for Visually Impaired people into 5 areas of London, and the National Tour of the Inner Vision Orchestra These activities have been celebrated in national and regional media including the BBC. The Orchestra and workshops were held under the direction of Baluji Shrivastav OBE, supported by Linda Shanson.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £28,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Birmingham City
- Kent
- Leeds City
- Manchester City
- Milton Keynes
- Rochdale
- Southampton City
- Stoke-on-trent City
- Wiltshire
- Throughout London
- India
Governance
- 06 August 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Satizabal Carrascal | Chair | 09 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Swan | Trustee | 06 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Linda Shanson | Trustee | 23 March 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.00k | £48.77k | £68.52k | £59.17k | £51.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.46k | £48.56k | £63.38k | £55.72k | £55.72k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £27.00k | £44.79k | £50.51k | £28.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 February 2024 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 February 2024 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 April 2022 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 April 2022 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 February 2021 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 February 2021 | 24 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 18 MARCH 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 6 JULY 2009
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN TRADITIONAL, CLASSICAL AND CONTEMPORARY INDIA MUSIC FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT 2 TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF DISABLED PEOPLE THROUGH THE ACCESS TO ARTISTIC EXPERIENCES
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 Northolme Road
LONDON
N5 2UU
- Phone:
- 07812590021
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window