Financial history INTERNATIONAL BACCALAUREATE FUND UK

Charity number: 1127386
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £675.51k £813.15k £840.36k £1.38m £1.53m
Total expenditure £718.63k £954.19k £928.25k £1.43m £1.82m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.25m
Income - Donations and legacies £598.14k £813.15k £840.36k £1.38m £1.53m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £74.79k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £11.58k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £718.63k £954.19k £928.25k £1.43m £1.82m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £14.66k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £11.99k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0