Financial history CROOK COMMUNITY PARTNERSHIP

Charity Number: 1127517
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013
Total gross income £84.78k £41.72k £20.62k £27.49k £34.39k
Total expenditure £40.68k £41.05k £42.97k £38.34k £35.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A