HEART OF WORSHIP CHRISTIAN CENTRE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Helping the Elderly people in our community.providing food,clothes etc *Engaging in CV- preparation .Job seach . SIA Badge/Training . CSCS Training/Cards . Esol,Interview tecniques *giving relief to youth, ill-health,Disable person and those with financial hardship or any other disadvantages and many more * Giving Advice And guidiance: Helping those addicted to drug and alcohol to freedom.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 29 October 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kennedy Mwanza Member | Trustee | 04 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Zourenah Ruby Harvey Member | Trustee | 04 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mwelwa Joy Makungu | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
NATALIYE UWAGBOE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.90k | £7.61k | £14.00k | £22.00k | £22.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.99k | £7.79k | £6.80k | £13.00k | £11.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 30 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 25 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 OCTOBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 13 SEPTEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
109 HURLINGHAM ROAD
BIRMINGHAM
B44 0LY
- Phone:
- 07787958312
- Email:
- heart-of-worship@live.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window