Financial history GREEN MASJID AND MADRASSAH

Charity number: 1127380
Charity reporting is overdue by 348 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/07/2018 30/07/2019 30/07/2020 30/07/2021 30/07/2022
Total gross income £14.99k £11.25k £8.05k £9.58k £6.73k
Total expenditure £13.48k £10.98k £7.93k £8.69k £7.09k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A