The British Omani Society

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the British public and Omani nationals by promoting learning & knowledge of Oman and the UK, their people, history, geography, economies and all aspects of their wider cultures, religions & customs by arranging lectures & meetings which may be open to the public; and by providing educational assistance through financial and logistical support in either country.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of Westminster
- Oman
Governance
- 16 January 2009: Standard registration
- THE ANGLO-OMANI SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Riyad Kamal Mohamed Daud | Trustee | 26 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Colonel Gordon Derek Allen QGM WKhM-G | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Mark Breeze | Trustee | 17 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Major General Richard James AEthelstan Stanford CB MBE | Trustee | 17 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
James Nicholas Geoffrey Bowden CMG OBE | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Scott Forsyth Dickson | Trustee | 19 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Patricia Mab Simpson | Trustee | 19 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Helen Martin | Trustee | 19 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sheikh Ma'an Al Rawahi | Trustee | 16 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr ELISABETH CLARA KENDALL DPHIL OXON | Trustee | 26 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
OLIVER EDWARD SIMON BLAKE | Trustee | 19 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
MARTYN CUTHBERT BISHOP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £605.43k | £522.78k | £488.30k | £663.78k | £456.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £594.85k | £462.56k | £588.68k | £499.65k | £508.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £13.45k | £14.63k | N/A | £16.32k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £6.88k | £2.59k | N/A | £7.50k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £556.60k | £438.80k | N/A | £426.14k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £28.51k | £66.77k | N/A | £213.81k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £559.00k | £434.10k | N/A | £474.11k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £35.84k | £28.46k | N/A | £25.54k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £20.28k | £9.84k | N/A | £20.92k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £163.32k | £88.22k | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 15 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 14 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 SEPTEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09 JUL 2013 as amended on 14 Aug 2023
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE BRITISH PUBLIC BY THE PROMOTION OF LEARNING AND A WIDER KNOWLEDGE ABOUT OMAN, ITS PEOPLE, HISTORY, GEOGRAPHY, ECONOMY, LITERATURE, ART, MUSIC, ANTIQUITIES, LANGUAGES, CULTURES, RELIGIONS, BELIEFS AND CUSTOMS BY ARRANGING LECTURES, SEMINARS AND MEETINGS, WHICH MAY BE OPEN TO THE PUBLIC; AND BY ASSISTING INDIVIDUALS AND ORGANISATIONS BY PROVIDING BURSARIES, SCHOLARSHIPS, AWARDS, AND FINANCIAL AND LOGISTICAL SUPPORT IN ORDER TO HELP THEM ATTAIN A WIDER KNOWLEDGE ABOUT OMAN. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF OMANI NATIONALS ABOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ITS PEOPLE, HISTORY, GEOGRAPHY, ECONOMY, LITERATURE, ART, MUSIC, HERITAGE, THE ENGLISH LANGUAGE, CULTURES, RELIGIONS, BELIEFS, CUSTOMS, INDUSTRY AND COMMERCE BY ARRANGING LECTURES AND MEETINGS, WHICH MAY BE OPEN TO THE PUBLIC; AND BY ASSISTING INDIVIDUALS AND ORGANISATIONS BY PROVIDING BURSARIES, AWARDS, SCHOLARSHIPS, TRAINING, APPRENTICESHIPS AND FINANCIAL AND LOGISTICAL SUPPORT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OMAN.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, OMAN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
34 SACKVILLE STREET
LONDON
W1S 3ED
- Phone:
- 0203 141 1763
- Email:
- manager@britishomani.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window