Accounts and annual returns GT WITCHINGHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 1127736
Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 117 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 February 2023 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 April 2022 66 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 07 April 2022 66 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 April 2022 430 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required