GT WITCHINGHAM VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To maintain, and promote the use of, the Great Witchingham Village Hall as a venue for community events. To facilitate local organisations, societies and groups holding regular meetings and classes. To enhance the quality of community life for the parish and its residents. To create an environment that supports a vibrant, successful and sustainable community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 28 January 2009: Standard registration
- G.W.V.H (Working name)
- THE GT. & LT WITCHINGHAM MEMORIAL HALL (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SANDRA SANDERS | Chair | 08 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm Roy Arthur Brown | Trustee | 22 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE SELF | Trustee | 08 June 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.71k | £13.26k | £26.03k | £15.23k | £11.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.03k | £13.35k | £6.97k | £13.82k | £14.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £25.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 27 February 2023 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 April 2022 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 April 2022 | 66 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 April 2022 | 430 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 20 NOVEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 18 MAY 2010. AS AMENDED ON 16/06/2015
Charitable objects
THE PROPERTY AND THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME SHALL BE APPLIED FOR THE PURPOSES OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF GT WITCHINGHAM WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, AGE, DISABILITY, NATIONALITY, RACE OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE OF THE PROPERTY FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES OR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
GT WITCHINGHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Great Witchingham Village Hall
Hubbards Loke
Gt Witchingham
Norfolk
NR9 5AZ
- Phone:
- 07340 304743
- Email:
- info@gwvh.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window