UK FRIENDS OF THE SCHNEIDER CHILDREN'S HOSPITAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fundraising for the purpose of sending money to the Schneider Childrens Medical Center of Israel for the purchase of medical equipment. During this financial year, payments were sent for the purchase of five separate items, all of which had been specially requested by the hospital
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Barnet
- Enfield
- Hertfordshire
- Israel
Governance
- 22 January 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Zena Behrman | Trustee | 03 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Jonathan Harry Samuel Arkush | Trustee | 03 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr DAVID PHILIP LIPKIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NORMAN ROSENBAUM BDS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £42.34k | £107.76k | £50.49k | £66.82k | £157.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.51k | £105.33k | £48.39k | £72.00k | £140.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 23 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 23 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 DECEMBER 2008
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY DISTRESS SICKNESS OR SUFFERING BY APPROPRIATE CHARITABLE (WHETHER MEDICAL, REHABILITATIVE, FINANCIAL OR OTHER) ASSISTANCE BY PROVISION OF MEDICAL AID TO THE NEEDY IN ISRAEL (B) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AMONG CHILDREN IN ISRAEL THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO THE SCHNEIDER CHILDREN'S MEDICAL CENTRE AND OTHER HOSPITALS IN ISRAEL PROVIDING MEDICAL CARE FOR CHILDREN (C) TO PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF CHILDREN RESIDING IN ISRAEL THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO THE SCHNEIDER CHILDREN'S MEDICAL CENTRE AND OTHER HOSPITALS IN ISRAEL TOWARDS THE COSTS OF BUILDING NEW MEDICAL HOSPITALS, MAINTAINING EXISTING MEDICAL HOSPITALS AND ASSISTING TOWARDS THE COST OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SERVICES FOR SUCH HOSPITALS (D) WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE FOREGOING TO MAKE GRANTS OR PAYMENTS TO CHARITABLE ASSOCIATIONS TRUSTS SOCIETIES OR CORPORATIONS FOR OR WHOSE OBJECTS INCLUDE THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES HEREINBEFORE DESCRIBED
Area of benefit
ISRAEL
Contact information
- Address:
-
HON TREASURER'S OFFICE
29 THE RISE
ELSTREE
BOREHAMWOOD
WD6 3JR
- Phone:
- 02089536474
- Email:
- james.larholt@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window