Financial history THE OPTIMUM HEALTH CLINIC FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1131664
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £41.97k £34.57k £1.69k £996 £996
Total expenditure £32.38k £34.25k £5.77k £396 £396
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A