Governance BRITAIN YEARLY MEETING OF THE RELIGIOUS SOCIETY OF FRIENDS (QUAKERS)
Charity number: 1127633
Up to date (14 days late)
Registration history:
- 20 January 2009: Standard registration
- 16 February 2016: Funds received from 264223 FRIENDS FELLOWSHIP OF HEALING (LATTENDALES)
- 08 March 2016: Funds received from 1131263 RESOLVE CYMRU LIMITED
- 30 November 2018: Funds received from 1118848 THE CHURCHES' AGENCY FOR SAFEGUARDING
- 16 July 2024: Funds received from 1093757 QUAKER CONCERN FOR THE ABOLITION OF TORTURE
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.