Financial history FAMILIES NEED FATHERS BOTH PARENTS MATTER CYMRU

Charity number: 1134723
Charity reporting is up to date (23 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £81.46k £67.66k £78.71k £96.44k £90.72k
Total expenditure £34.32k £44.94k £68.72k £85.94k £89.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £26.85k N/A N/A N/A N/A