UPCHURCH CRICKET CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Cricket Club
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 02 April 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
George Taylor | Trustee | 17 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Carlton | Trustee | 30 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £59.26k | £55.71k | £58.01k | £107.68k | £155.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.99k | £49.44k | £57.71k | £89.48k | £144.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 30 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 08 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 08 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 29 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 27 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 27 December 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
TO FOSTER AND PROMOTE THE SPORT OF CRICKET AT ALL LEVELS WITHIN THE COMMUNITY AND WITHIN THE SPORT, PROVIDING OPPORTUNITIES FOR RECREATION, COACHING AND COMPETITION. TO MANAGE THE FACILITY OF UPCHURCH CRICKET CLUB. TO ENSURE THAT ALL MEMBERS, PLAYING AND NON-PLAYING, ABIDE BY THE ECB CODE OF CONDUCT WHICH INCORPORATES THE SPIRIT OF CRICKET AND BY THE LAWS OF CRICKET. TO ENSURE A DUTY OF CARE TO ALL MEMBERS OF THE CLUB BY ADOPTING AND IMPLEMENTING THE ECB 'SAFE HANDS - CRICKET'S POLICY FOR SAFEGUARDING CHILDREN' AND ANY FUTURE VERSIONS OF THE POLICY. TO ENSURE A DUTY OF CARE TO ALL MEMBERS OF THE CLUB BY ADOPTING AND IMPLEMENTING THE ECB CRICKET EQUITY POLICY AND ANY FUTURE VERSIONS OF THE POLICY. TO ENCOURAGE AIL MEMBERS TO PARTICIPATE FULLY IN THE ACTIVITIES OF THE CLUB.
Area of benefit
UPCHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOLYWELL LANE
UPCHURCH
SITTINGBOURNE
ME9 7HN
- Phone:
- 01634 262475
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window