Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BINLEY COVENTRY
Charity number: 1127406

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV JONATHAN PAUL TAYLOR | Chair | 23 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Rev James Edward Matthew Bremner | Trustee | 03 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Raymond George Schoolar | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Leslie Owen | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard William Bromley | Trustee | 14 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Lesley Murray | Trustee | 18 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Allen | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Elizabeth Sherry | Trustee | 13 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALISON JANE GRIMWOOD | Trustee | 24 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN LESLIE SLATER | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.