THE BALFOUR BEATTY CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Shaping Better Futures supports underrepresented and hard to reach groups through advice, training, education and other activities as a means of encouraging and helping them develop skills and capabilities to enter employment related to construction and infrastructure. We also support local community regeneration for the public benefit through advice and/or physical or environmental improvements.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 09 January 2009: Standard registration
- 03 December 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- Shaping Better Futures - The Balfour Beatty Charitable Trust (Working name)
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £166.36k | £120.97k | £110.84k | £107.15k | £100.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £71.41k | £150.22k | £66.85k | £93.74k | £91.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 November 2021 | 30 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 November 2021 | 30 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 27 August 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 27 August 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 17 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 17 October 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 8 JANUARY 2009
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM DISADVANTAGE BY ASSISTING WITH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, TRAINING AND EDUCATION AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF ENCOURAGING AND HELPING THEM TO DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO ENTER AND PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED, IN PRACTICE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window