THE BRAMPTON WOODWORKERS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a members' club based at a fully equipped workshop in Brampton, Cumbria. Membership is open to all adults in the wider community and our members are mainly retired/semi-retired. We work on our own projects with help and guidance from a fully qualified tutor. In addition to our weekly workshops, we hold social events for members and open days for the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cumbria
Governance
- 26 January 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Keith Burdis | Chair | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Coulthard | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Angus Timmins | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Norman Parry | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.32k | £1.27k | £8.49k | £14.19k | £14.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.94k | £1.34k | £8.85k | £13.51k | £16.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 17 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20 NOVEMBER 2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 20 JANUARY 2009
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE ADULT PUBLIC IN THE SUBJECT OF WOODWORKING SKILLS AND CRAFT INCLUDING RELEVANT SAFETY RULES AND WELFARE REGULATIONS IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND PRACTICAL SESSIONS AND THE PROVISION OF A FORUM FOR ALL WOODWORKERS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Eskdale House
Shield Hill
HALTWHISTLE
Northumberland
NE49 9LT
- Phone:
- 01434322229
- Email:
- spy1066@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window