Accounts and annual returns BRITISH FRIENDS OF THE DAVID YELLIN ACADEMIC COLLEGE OF EDUCATION

Charity number: 1127742
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 01 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 01 May 2025 182 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 20 February 2025 478 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 20 February 2025 843 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1289 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1289 days