THE VOICE PROJECT LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Voice Project is a contemporary vocal music education and performance project, based in Norwich. It specialises in creating large scale, open access community projects, innovative music festivals and events. It also has a programme of professional research, development and performance activities involving leading vocal performers, composers, improvisers and instrumentalists.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- East Sussex
- Norfolk
Governance
- 05 February 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NICOLA MAY STAINTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN GUTHRIE | Trustee | 13 October 2014 |
|
|||||
STEPHEN ALLISON FORSTER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.74k | £124.60k | £78.13k | £97.34k | £53.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.60k | £112.27k | £90.55k | £90.47k | £47.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | £77.51k | £25.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 APRIL 2008
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, PARTICULARLY THOSE MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC WHO ARE RESIDENT IN NORWICH AND NORFOLK ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") IN THE ARTS (SPECIFICALLY MUSIC) 2 TO PROMOTE HEALTH THROUGH INVOLVEMENT IN HEALTHY ACTIVITY 3 TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AS THE CHARITY MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE
Area of benefit
NORWICH AND NORFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
90 Upper St. Giles Street
NORWICH
NR2 1LT
- Phone:
- 07940308920
- Email:
- info@voiceproject.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window