BROOKS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WORKS TO CREATE VIBRANT, TOLERANT AND FLOURISHING SOCIETIES. PROVIDES GRANTS TO ORGANISATIONS TO SUPPORT ADVOCACY AND INNOVATIVE PROJECT WORK GLOBALLY. WORKS WITH PARTNERS FOCUSED ON WOMEN AND GIRLS, CHILDREN AND YOUTH, AND PEACE BUILDING WHO ARE CHALLENGING HARMFUL SOCIAL NORMS AND SOCIAL INJUSTICE AND BRINGING ABOUT SOCIAL CHANGE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 09 February 2009: Standard registration
- 18 February 2016: Funds received from 1056752 THE WIGWAM TRUST
- BOULTBEE FOUNDATION (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KIM VALE | Trustee | 12 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA CLAIRE BROOKS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEVEN JOHN BOULTBEE BROOKS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £88.32k | £6.99k | £1.14k | £1.00k | £1.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £128.27k | £62.16k | £38.02k | £11.92k | £11.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 07 March 2024 | 31 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 29 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 10 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 14 October 2020 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | 14 October 2020 | 14 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 02/01/2009 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 28/08/2012
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER SUCH OBJECTS OR PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
117 GEORGE STREET
LONDON
W1H 7HF
- Phone:
- 02077271129
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window