Accounts and annual returns EMPOWERING YOUTH FOUNDATION
Charity number: 1127697
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 20 July 2020 | 356 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2017 | 09 July 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2016 | 07 July 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2016 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window