Financial history UNITED IN THE COMMUNITY

Charity number: 1127857
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £69.85k £4.61k £10.07k £11.45k £11.90k
Total expenditure £72.43k £3.99k £8.93k £11.06k £12.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £20.00k N/A N/A £5.37k N/A