STEVENAGE EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity started operating from Sept. 2011 on behalf of the schools and College in Stevenage. It is developing staff development with organisations such as Wolfson College, Cambridge University and associated support for young people and their families in Stevenage schools.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 27 July 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steve Fuller | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Davinder Khangura | Trustee | 10 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Russell | Trustee | 02 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Bell | Trustee | 20 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Corrina Reeder | Trustee | 20 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Nearney | Trustee | 15 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.86k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 21 August 2024 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 03 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 14 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 19 March 2021 | 262 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 11/11/2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/06/2013
Charitable objects
1)TO PROVIDE STAFF WITHIN STEVENAGE SCHOOLS WITH AN ENTITLEMENT TO A HIGH QUALITY CONTINUING PROFESSIONAL DEVELOPMENT PROGRAMME 2)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT STEVENAGE SCHOOLS AND OTHER MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY OF STEVENAGE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o Barnwell School
Shephall Green
STEVENAGE
Hertfordshire
SG2 9XT
- Phone:
- 01438222500
- Email:
- set@educationtrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window