THE ASSYRIAN SOCIETY LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity was formed to accept a legacy from Dr Victoria Sarmas Will ,who died on 19th May 2007. On 31/12 2009 the executors of the will ,Child & Child had not executed . Therefore ,there were no charity activities. In June 2011 the executors paid £123226.59 . No charity activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
Governance
- 06 May 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Baba Babakhan | Trustee | 01 September 2009 |
|
|
||||
PRAIDON YOARISH DARMOO | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
THOMAS KHOSHABA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £182 | £57 | £30 | £55 | £1.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.65k | £837 | £3.37k | £3.81k | £1.94k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2023 | 354 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 December 2021 | 53 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 OCTOBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 29 MARCH 2009
Charitable objects
"1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING THE STUDY AND GENERAL KNOWLEDGE OF ALL THINGS ASSYRIAN AND BABYLONIAN, BY ESTABLISHING AND MAINTAINING A LIBRARY (TO BE KNOWN AS THE DR VICTORIA SARMAS LIBRARY) AND BY PROVIDING A SCHOOL OPEN TO ALL MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC TO TEACH THE ASSYRIAN LANGUAGE, HERITAGE AND CULTURE. 2. TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LONDON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. 3. TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE."
Area of benefit
LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
ASSYRIAN HOUSE
TEMPLE ROAD
LONDON
W5 4SL
- Phone:
- 07831368520
- Email:
- bobbabakhan@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window