GURU NANAK GURDWARA AND SIKH CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the Sikh religion. To promote an understanding of, and respect for, the Sikh religion. To promote any charitable purpose for the benefit of the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 14 August 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KASHMIR SINGH | Chair | 15 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
Suinder Singh | Trustee | 18 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gurbhej Singh Sandhu | Trustee | 23 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Manjit Singh Khattra | Trustee | 23 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Amrick Singh Devgon | Trustee | 23 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
KAKA SINGH | Trustee | 01 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
SUKDEV SINGH | Trustee | 28 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
PRITPAL SINGH | Trustee | 06 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
SANTOKH SINGH GARCHA | Trustee | 15 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
PARMINDER SINGH CHEEMA | Trustee | 15 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOGINDER SINGH KULLAR | Trustee | 17 November 2011 |
|
|
||||
SOHAN SINGH GREWAL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £112.36k | £83.58k | £115.71k | £93.83k | £90.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £192.92k | £66.39k | £48.00k | £40.95k | £71.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £40.00k | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 November 2023 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 November 2023 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 January 2022 | 71 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 January 2022 | 71 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 March 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 JULY 2009
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE SIKH RELIGION IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE OBSERVATION AND PROMOTION OF THE PRINCIPLES OF THE GURU GRANTH SAHIB JI. 2. TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE SIKH FAITH AND THE PRINCIPLES OF THE REHAT MARYADA. 3. TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND IN PARTICULAR, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE FOREGOING, THE SIKH COMMUNITY, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SIKH COMMUNITY AND LOCAL AUTHORITIES AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON PURPOSE TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR LEISURE AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 LIVERPOOL ROAD
STOKE-ON-TRENT
ST4 1AQ
- Phone:
- 01782847897
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window