Financial history YORK CARERS CENTRE

Charity number: 1127644
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £489.22k £521.96k £633.76k £689.48k £664.87k
Total expenditure £494.39k £497.33k £605.24k £622.25k £658.09k
Income from government contracts £444.29k £437.76k £464.58k £494.78k £481.29k
Income from government grants N/A £6.91k N/A £8.00k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £13.50k £5.63k £10.38k £10.59k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £66 £1.03k £1.78k £2.91k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £508.40k £627.10k £677.32k £645.68k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £5.69k
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £497.33k £605.24k £622.25k £658.09k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A £2.07k £2.38k £3.54k £3.01k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £0