Trustees YORK CARERS CENTRE

Charity number: 1127644
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ROSEMARIE JEANETTE TEMPLE Chair
FRIENDS OF MAHER (UK)
Received: On time
Sophie Elliott Trustee 24 February 2025
None on record
James Wainwright Trustee 24 February 2025
None on record
Verity Winterburn Trustee 13 January 2025
None on record
Jackie Chapman Trustee 01 April 2023
None on record
Elizabeth Ryan Trustee 30 September 2022
None on record
Lisa Shelbourn Trustee 06 November 2017
None on record
Chris Durant Trustee 22 September 2016
None on record
JAMES PETER ROSS DEAN Trustee
None on record