MAKE SOME NOISE LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Make Some Noise's vision is that the lifes of children and young people in Staffordshire and Stoke - on - Trent will be significantly enhanced by high quality opportunities to make music.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Birmingham City
- Staffordshire
- Stoke-on-trent City
- Telford & Wrekin
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 19 January 2009: Standard registration
- MAKE SOME NOISE (Working name)
- MAKE SOME NOISE WEST MIDLANDS LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Senior | Chair | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Jayne Whitmore | Trustee | 12 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Bryony Elizabeth Robinson | Trustee | 18 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Malik Sohrab Uduman | Trustee | 18 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julie Tanner | Trustee | 18 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rosie Milsom | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Nathan Rhys Harrington-Jones | Trustee | 25 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £265.38k | £359.10k | £271.94k | £181.91k | £281.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £291.70k | £274.98k | £291.42k | £238.34k | £187.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £102.73k | £45.50k | £47.20k | £6.59k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 02 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02/12/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 21/10/2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE EDUCATION IN THE ARTS, ESPECIALLY BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE ART OF MUSIC, FOR YOUNG PEOPLE AND FOR THOSE WHO ASSIST YOUNG PEOPLE IN TAKING PART IN MUSIC AND THE ARTS.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o 2 Staffordshire Place
Tipping Street
STAFFORD
ST16 2LP
- Phone:
- 01785278454
- Email:
- info@make-some-noise.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window