Financial history LANCASTER DISTRICT COMMUNITY & VOLUNTARY SOLUTIONS

Charity number: 1127626
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £302.97k £335.74k £705.15k £917.53k £765.88k
Total expenditure £139.48k £402.77k £606.37k £879.68k £742.37k
Income from government contracts N/A £11.12k £56.00k N/A £126.24k
Income from government grants £201.26k £44.40k £115.93k £104.28k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £11.76k £11.88k £0
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £58.12k £76.57k £44.07k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £634.95k £824.65k £710.66k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £0 £4.44k £11.15k
Income - Other N/A N/A £317 £0 £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £606.37k £879.07k £742.37k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £0 £601 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £42 £389 £203
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 £0 £344.49k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 £0 £0