Financial history SAI TRUST

Charity number: 1130577
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £42.30k £25.09k £31.90k £42.37k £39.05k
Total expenditure £43.19k £18.71k £17.76k £42.58k £28.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A