THE FORGE PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Drop-in day centre for homeless and vulnerable housed adults, including engaging in activities, volunteer program, work experience placements, referrals, general support, food parcels, breakfast, lunch, listening and befriending service, partnership working with drug and alcohol, mental health and local authority housing advice and support teams.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £16,709 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- North Lincolnshire
Governance
- 16 February 2010: Standard registration
- THE FORGE PROJECT LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julie Deborah Reed | Chair | 04 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
JAMES ANTHONY JOZEF JELLINEK | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Marnie Chittenden | Trustee | 11 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Deirdre Walshe | Trustee | 13 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simon John Linden Batt | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Vollans | Trustee | 17 April 2020 |
|
|||||
PETER FREDERICK BELL BSC | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £165.78k | £195.32k | £206.01k | £262.34k | £219.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £135.70k | £137.22k | £155.97k | £204.81k | £223.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.50k | £25.21k | £75.63k | N/A | £16.71k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 07 February 2022 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 07 February 2022 | 7 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 OCTOBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22 OCTOBER 2010 AND BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 7 JANUARY 2010 AND SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 27 JULY 2010. MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 22/06/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 13/02/2015
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE SUPPORT AND RELIEF TO HOMELESS AND OTHER VULNERABLE INDIVIDUALS AND FAMILIES WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS IN SCUNTHORPE AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Area of benefit
SCUNTHORPE AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Forge Project
Methodist Church
Cottage Beck Road
SCUNTHORPE
DN16 1UB
- Phone:
- 01724276742
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window