CHICHESTER BAPTIST CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We aim to worship God and we seek to communicate the truths of the Christian faith in an understandable and relevant way to help people to commit to and become more like Jesus. We aim to help people in need locally and beyond and so we are actively involved in serving our community. Our premises are used by a variety of organisations for the benefit of our local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- West Sussex
Governance
- 26 January 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CALVIN RICHARD HOLLINGWORTH | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Joanne Hawker | Trustee | 27 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Guy Robert Overton Applebee | Trustee | 20 February 2014 |
|
|||||
Andrew James Morgan | Trustee | 13 February 2014 |
|
|||||
THOMAS GEORGE SNOW | Trustee | 17 February 2012 |
|
|||||
ELLEN CAROLINE WILD | Trustee | 23 November 2011 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £390.76k | £317.76k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £387.23k | £324.67k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 November 2023 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 November 2022 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 09 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 9 JULY 2008
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSE OF THE CHURCH IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO THE PRINCIPLES OF THE BAPTIST DENOMINATION. THE CHURCH MAY ALSO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHICHESTER BAPTIST CHURCH
124 SHERBORNE ROAD
CHICHESTER
PO19 3AW
- Phone:
- 01243782582
- Email:
- info@chichesterbaptist.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window