Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CHRIST CHURCH DORE

Charity number: 1128106
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £158.40k £164.87k £164.87k £443.61k £625.90k
Total expenditure £144.03k £168.95k £168.88k £321.85k £879.72k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.20k £1.21k £6.06k N/A £71.65k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £491.28k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £289
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.08k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £20.27k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £112.97k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £5.12k
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £879.60k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £123
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £1.25k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £5.22k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0