STRATFORD ISLAMIC CULTURAL CENTRE TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance further the Islamic faith by providing for the erection and maintenance in the East London, of a fitting Mosque to be used by Muslims of East London and from any other part of the world for worship according to the religion of Islam. To advance the education of the public in particular but not exclusively in the Muslim Community of London.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Newham
Governance
- 13 March 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ABDUL MATIN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Mohammed Nizamul Islam Chowdhury | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Abdur Rahman | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Muhibur Rahman | Trustee | 01 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
BODRUL ISLAM | Trustee | 22 July 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.71k | £12.12k | £13.31k | £13.44k | £9.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.24k | £11.79k | £11.18k | £13.30k | £11.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £6.64k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 10 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 10 June 2024 | 254 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 21 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 26 October 2020 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 NOVEMBER 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 16 FEBRUARY 2009
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN STRATFORD AND SURROUNDING AREA PARTICULARLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE ISLAMIC FAITH. 2. TO ADVANCE THE ISLAMIC FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON THE ISLAMIC FAITH AND TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT ISLAM. 3. TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE- TIME OCCUPATION IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF COMMUNITY IN STRATFORD, AND THE SURROUNDING AREA,
Area of benefit
STRATFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
101 MARYLAND STREET
LONDON
E15 1JD
- Phone:
- 07950485194
- Email:
- abdul.matin62@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window