Accounts and annual returns MUSLIM CULTURAL SOCIETY OF LEEDS
Charity number: 1128156
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 11 May 2012 | 101 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 12 April 2012 | 72 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 14 June 2011 | 134 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 03 June 2011 | 123 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window