Financial history JUSTIN'S TRUST FOR DOGS IN EUROPE

Charity number: 1128182
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014 31/12/2015
Total gross income £6.46k £10.96k £5.68k £5.76k £6.21k
Total expenditure £7.18k £10.97k £5.78k £5.75k £6.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A