Global Health Alliance Foundation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. Health Projects : Healthy Heart Screening, HCP Education & Public Awareness. Screening for conventional risk factors for heart diseases including Hypertension, Diabetes, Hypercholestremia, Renal & Healthy lifestyle advice. 2. Working towards SDGs. 3.Creating Awareness about Health problems & Disease. 4. Funding Health Projects 5. Research & Policy work
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
- United States
Governance
- 11 February 2009: Standard registration
- THE BIHAR DEVELOPMENT FOUNDATION UK (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Anurodh Bhawnani | Trustee | 06 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ashok Pathak | Trustee |
|
||||||
Dr RAJAY NARAIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PRF GAJENDRA VERMA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5 | £11 | £4.22k | £218 | £218 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.15k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 March 2024 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 18 March 2022 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 8 FEBRUARY 2009 as amended on 06 Nov 2020
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND DONATIONS FOR SUCH CHARITABLE ASSOCIATIONS, BODIES AND ORGANISATIONS AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTION DISCRETION SHALL THINK FIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY WORKING IN THE AREAS RELATED TO HEALTH, EDUCATION AND VOCATIONAL TRAINING AND POVERTY RELIEF.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, OVERSEAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
133 Chadacre Road
EPSOM
Surrey
KT17 2HQ
- Phone:
- 07919522163
- Email:
- ghahealth@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window