WASHINGTON UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Washington U3A provide a list of activities for people who are retired 'but not retiring' These activities inlclude:- Digital photography and computing, family history, garden club, luncheons, ladies swimming, quiz, relaxation, pergamano, scrabble, dominoes, whist, singing, strolling, travel and walking.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Sunderland
Governance
- 04 February 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin Hughes | Trustee | 11 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elvira Pirozzi | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Steanson | Trustee | 13 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Diana Clark | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daid James Taylor | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
James Mills Redden | Trustee | 01 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Linda Carr | Trustee | 13 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Cullen | Trustee | 14 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANNE MOFFATT | Trustee | 12 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.60k | £5.71k | £7.01k | £7.22k | £2.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.59k | £3.26k | £5.71k | £5.60k | £2.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 28 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2022 | 289 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 April 2021 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10/06/2003 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 12 JUL 2018
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND, IN PARTICULAR, THE EDUCATION OF OLDER PEOPLE AND THOSE WHO ARE RETIRED FROM FULL TIME WORK, BY ALL MEANS INCLUDING ASSOCIATED ACTIVITIES CONDUCIVE TO LEARNING AND PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT.
Area of benefit
WASHINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Grasslees
WASHINGTON
Tyne And Wear
NE38 9JA
- Phone:
- 01914168698
- Email:
- secretarywashu3a@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window