BUTTERCUP CHILDREN'S TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote any charitable purpose for the benefit of children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 12 February 2009: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOSEPH LIONEL TELEMACQUE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
RONALD KENNETH COULTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TONY JACK THORNTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.49k | £9.22k | £12.37k | £22.14k | £7.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.37k | £14.36k | £10.73k | £13.67k | £14.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 13 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 05 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 7 AUGUST 2008 AS AMENDED BY CHANGE OF NAME 13 OCTOBER 2008
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN IN THE UK AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE WHO ARE SICK OR DISABLED, BY THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO INDIVIDUALS, INCLUDING HOLIDAYS FOR THEMSELVES AND THEIR FAMILIES, TO SUPPORT THE CHARITABLE WORK OF OTHER INSTITUTIONS.
Area of benefit
UK
Contact information
- Address:
-
Suite 11
Enterprise Hub
62 Tong Street
Bradford
BD4 9LX
- Phone:
- 01274200859
- Website:
-
buttercupchildrenstrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window