EAST AFRICA WELFARE AND DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EAWDA has carried projects sponsoring orphans, digging wells, Qurbani, food packs, medicine. This year also provided clean water creating reservoirs, water well and borehole pumps in Somaliland. A new project of school has also been initiated this year. (Country of operation is Somaliland which is not found in drop-down option. Hence, Somalia is selected)
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Animals
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Somalia
Governance
- 24 February 2009: Standard registration
- EAST AFRICAN WELFARE AND DEVELOPMENT ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
HASSAN SAED ADAM | Chair | 02 June 2008 |
|
|
||||
Abdi-Fatah Adam | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
FAISAL ADAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £206.16k | £233.30k | £157.98k | £214.87k | £159.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £216.64k | £170.69k | £187.54k | £222.48k | £142.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 28 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 11 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 11 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 15 May 2023 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 14 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 19 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 21 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 2 JUNE 2008
Charitable objects
* TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR THEIR ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES OF (PRINCIPALLY) YOUNG PEOPLE WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE * TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF PEOPLE IN SOMALIA AND THE SOMALI COMMUNITY IN THE UK
Area of benefit
SOMALIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 72
Ansell House
Mile End Road
LONDON
E1 4UX
- Phone:
- 02077917491
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window